MA H4451 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 154 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 154 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee of conference on the disagreeing votes of the two branches with reference to the Senate amendment of the House Bill making appropriations for fiscal year 2017 (House, No. 3401), reports, in part, recommending passage of the accompanying bill (House, No. 4451). June 29, 2016.
Title
Relative to Nickerson State Park
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 154 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #388 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0] |
2016-07-07 | House | Enacted 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 292) |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-06-30 | House | Committee of conference report accepted |
2016-06-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-06-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2016-06-29 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-06-29 | House | Reported on a part of H4201 |
2016-06-29 | House | Reported from the committee of conference |
Same As/Similar To
H4727 (Similar To) 2016-11-14 - Senate concurred
S8 (Similar To) -
H2016 (Similar To) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H56
H54 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S8 (Similar To) -
H2016 (Similar To) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H56
H54 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4451 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4451.pdf |