MA H4438 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4570
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4570
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the State Treasurer to appropriate funds payments due in accordance with a certain civil judgment of the abuse by state employees documented in Davis v. Rennie, et al. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Providing payment to the estate of Jason Davis
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4570 |
2022-02-10 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 02/18/2022 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-02-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/17/2022 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-11-24 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4570 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4438 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4438.pdf |