MA H4417 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 329 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 329 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Kafka of Stoughton, a petition of Louis L. Kafka, William C. Galvin and Brian A. Joyce (by vote of the town) that the town of Stoughton be authorized to establish the position of deputy police chief and exempt said position from the provisions of civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Establishing the position of Deputy Chief of the Stoughton Police Department and exempting the position from the civil service laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-19 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 329 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-11-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-11-15 | House | Enacted |
2012-11-13 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed), and passed to be engrossed |
2012-11-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-09-24 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-09-20 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-09-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-09-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-09-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-09-17 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-08-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-08-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4417 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119746&generalCourtId=1 |