MA H439 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4417

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4417
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to transparency and accountability in charter school finances. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to transparency and accountability in charter school finance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-26HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4417
2023-05-31JointHearing scheduled for 06/12/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H633 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H2394 (Similar To) 2024-06-10 - Senate concurred
H2851 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H4417 (Replaced by) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback