MA H4380 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 371 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 371 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act further regulating limited liability companies Substituted by the House, on a motion of Mr. Coppinger of Boston, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 3944). July 30, 2014.
Title
Further regulating limited liability companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 371 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-10-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-10-31 | House | Enacted |
2014-10-30 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-10-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-10-30 | Senate | Committee recommended that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-07-30 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-30 | House | Substituted for H3944 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4380 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4380.pdf |