MA H4378 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 267 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 267 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to organ retention Substituted by the House, on a motion of Mr. Hunt of Boston, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 2106). July 30, 2014.
Title
Relative to organ retention
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-08 | House | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 267 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-07-31 | House | Enacted |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-30 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-30 | House | Substituted for H2106 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4378 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4378.pdf |