MA H4359 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2812
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the licensure of swimming pool builders and service contractors
Title
Relative to the licensure of swimming pool builders and service contractors
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-04-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-04-04 | House | New draft of H2812 |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2812 (Replaces) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4359
H111 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1303 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H2736 (Similar To) 2017-08-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3866
H181 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1904 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H111 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1303 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H2736 (Similar To) 2017-08-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3866
H181 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1904 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4359 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4359.pdf |