MA H2812 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4359
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4359
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to licensing of swimming pool construction and installation work and swimming pool maintenance and repair work. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the licensure of swimming pool builders and service contractors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4359 |
2017-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H111 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1303 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H181 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S337 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S1162 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H2736 (Similar To) 2017-08-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3866
H1904 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4359 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1303 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H181 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S337 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S1162 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H2736 (Similar To) 2017-08-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3866
H1904 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4359 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2812 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2812.pdf |