MA H4347 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 433 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 433 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to retail licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages at continuing care retirement communities Substituted by the House, on a motion of Mr. McMurtry of Dedham, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 3779). July 24, 2014.
Title
Relative to retail licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages at continuing care retirement communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 433 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-12-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-12-24 | House | Enacted |
2014-12-22 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-12-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2407 |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Read second |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2407 |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-07-24 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-24 | House | Substituted for H3779 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4347 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4347.pdf |