MA H4334 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2160
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to mortgage licensing and exemptions.
Title
Relative to mortgage licensing and exemptions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-03-26 | House | New draft of H2160 |
2018-03-26 | House | Reported from the committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2160 (Replaces) 2018-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4334
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H52 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H52 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4334 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4334.pdf |