MA H432 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S285
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Malia of Boston, a petition of Elizabeth A. Malia, Thomas P. Kennedy and Denise C. Garlick that the Commissioner of the Department of Early Education and Care be directed to ensure reasonable assignment levels for day care centers and family day care homes. Education.
Title
Creating assignment levels in the Department of Early Education and Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-03-31 | House | Accompanied by S285 |
2015-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S285 (Replaces) 2016-03-31 - Accompanied H432
H1804 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2009 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1805 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H3038 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
H526 (Similar To) 2016-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4535
H1804 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2009 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1805 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H3038 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
H526 (Similar To) 2016-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4535
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H432 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H432.pdf |