MA H4307 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate insurance claims. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to insurance claims
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-04-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-04-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-04-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-02-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
2023-12-07 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3686 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4307 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4307.pdf |