MA H3686 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Day of Stoneham, a petition of Michael S. Day that retailers of home heating oil provide notices to customers of the availability of liability insurance coverage for certain claims arising out of releases of oil into the environment. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Requiring disclosure to consumers regarding home heating oil insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2024-05-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-05-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-04-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H1129 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S648 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2737
S2737 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S648 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2737
S2737 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3686 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3686.pdf |