MA H4289 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3976
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4370
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4370
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Town of Lynnfield to grant additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages
Title
Authorizing the Town of Lynnfield to grant additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4370 |
2018-04-04 | House | Read third (title changed) |
2018-03-12 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-03-12 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-03-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-03-06 | House | New draft of H3976 |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3976 (Replaces) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H3972 (Similar To) 2017-11-07 - Amendment #1 (Jones) adopted
H1852 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4010 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2017
H3977 (Similar To) 2018-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2017
H4353 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3972 (Similar To) 2017-11-07 - Amendment #1 (Jones) adopted
H1852 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4010 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 121 of the Acts of 2017
H3977 (Similar To) 2018-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 173 of the Acts of 2017
H4353 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4289 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4289.pdf |