MA H3976 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Lynnfield be authorized to grant five additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Town of Lynnfield to grant additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-09JointHearing scheduled for 11/14/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2017-10-30SenateSenate concurred
2017-10-25HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H3972 (Similar To) 2017-11-07 - Amendment #1 (Jones) adopted
H1852 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H3977 (Similar To) 2017-10-30 - Senate concurred
H3880 (Similar To) 2017-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2017
H3897 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2017
H4010 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - Enacted and laid before the Governor

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback