MA H4271 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1721
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to authorizing the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight to make an investigation and study of a certain House document concerning the state building code
Title
The state building code
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-09 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2018-03-09 | House | Order reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2018-03-09 | House | Accompanied by H1721 |
2018-03-09 | House | Reported from the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H1721 (Replaces) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4271
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H52 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H52 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4271 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4271.pdf |