MA H4270 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to administrative costs of the Department of Family and Medical Leave. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to adding efficiency to paid family and medical leave
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2024-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2024 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-01-18 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4270 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4270.pdf |