MA H4270 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1383
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2-1-1)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting non consensual pelvic examinations
Title
Prohibiting non consensual pelvic examinations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-02 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-12-02 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2021-12-02 | House | New draft of S1383 and H2267 |
2021-12-02 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1383 (Replaces) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4270
H2267 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4270
S1299 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1417 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H1618 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2405 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
H2267 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4270
S1299 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1417 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
H1618 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2405 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5035
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4270 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4270.pdf |