MA S1299 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5225
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to enhance patient education and informed consent before issuance of opioids. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
To enhance patient education and informed consent before issuance of opioids
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5225 |
2021-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
H2093 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S1309 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5225 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1428 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H2398 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5461
S1309 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5225 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1428 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H2398 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5461
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1299 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1299.pdf |