MA H4266 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1856
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6-1-1)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to agricultural commission input on board of health regulations
Title
Relative to agricultural commission input on board of health regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-12-26 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-12-26 | House | New draft of H1856 |
2019-12-26 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1856 (Replaces) 2019-12-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4266
S1268 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2446
H3612 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S2446 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 321 of the Acts of 2020
S1268 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2446
H3612 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S2446 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 321 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4266 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4266.pdf |