MA H1856 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4266
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to agricultural commission input on board of health regulations. Public Health.
Title
Relative to agricultural commission input on board of health regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4266 |
2019-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1268 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2446
H3612 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H4266 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3612 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H4266 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1856 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1856.pdf |