MA H4259 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1352
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to public hearings of the Group Insurance Commission
Title
Relative to public hearings of the Group Insurance Commission
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-06-14 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 13, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-05 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2018-03-05 | House | New draft of H1352 |
2018-03-05 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1352 (Replaces) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4259
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1336 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1407 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1448 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1336 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1407 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1448 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4259 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4259.pdf |