MA H4247 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4679
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish additional mandated reporters for the purposes of the protection and care of children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To authorize the Commonwealth of Massachusetts to establish additional mandated reporters for the purpose of the protection and care of children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4679 |
2016-04-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2016 from 10:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-04-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4679 (Replaced by) 2016-10-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H69 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H2447 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H307 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2446 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - Accompanied H2517
H539 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H69 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H2447 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H307 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2446 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - Accompanied H2517
H539 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4247 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4247.pdf |