MA H4244 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Dunstable be authorized to change the name of the board of selectmen to the select board in said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Changing the board of selectmen in the town of Dunstable to the select board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 208 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2024-09-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-09-12 | House | Enacted |
2024-09-09 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2024-09-09 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-03-21 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-03-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-02-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2371 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2024
H4059 (Similar To) 2024-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H3842 (Similar To) 2023-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2023
S2855 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2937
S2937 (Similar To) 2024-11-18 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2983
H4059 (Similar To) 2024-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H3842 (Similar To) 2023-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 65 of the Acts of 2023
S2855 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2937
S2937 (Similar To) 2024-11-18 - New draft (Pacheco) substituted, see S2983
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4244 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4244.pdf |