MA S2422 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 136 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 136 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to change the board of selectmen in the town of East Bridgewater to a select board. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]
Title
Changing the board of selectmen in the town of East Bridgewater to a select board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 136 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2024-07-18 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-07-18 | House | Enacted |
2024-07-17 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-07-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-07-01 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-07-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-07-01 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-06-05 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2023-10-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-10-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2023-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2023 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-07-17 | House | House concurred |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3871 (Similar To) 2024-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H3453 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H3453 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2422 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2422.pdf |