MA H4243 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to validate a vote providing for the laying out and acceptance of certain ways by the city of Attleboro. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Validating a certain vote taken by the city of Attleboro in Ch.228 of the Acts of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-04-04 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2024-03-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-03-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S1665 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
S1677 (Similar To) 2023-12-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1677 (Similar To) 2023-12-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4243 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4243.pdf |