MA H4238 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4829
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4829
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4829
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the information technology systems and capacities of the judiciary. The Judiciary.
Title
To improve and modernize the information technology systems and capacities of the judiciary
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4829 |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-05-11 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-01-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2020 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-11-22 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2019-11-12 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4829 (Replaced by) 2020-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4238 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4238.pdf |