MA H4235 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2839
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on July 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2839
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2839
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate access to certain library materials. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Protecting against attempts to ban, remove, or restrict library access to materials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2839 |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-06-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 28, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday June 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-12-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-12-26 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
2023-07-17 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2839 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S2447 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2839
S2447 (Similar To) 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2839
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4235 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4235.pdf |