MA H4234 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S424
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing plastic bag pollution
Title
Reducing plastic bag pollution
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-02-15 | House | New draft of S424 and H2121 |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4114 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H557 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1684 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H872 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H412 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S424 (Replaces) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4234
H2169 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H557 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1684 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H872 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H412 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S424 (Replaces) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4234
H2169 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4234 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4234.pdf |