MA H4233 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H431
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to farmers’ markets
Title
Relative to farmers’ markets
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-05-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-02-15 | House | New draft of H431 and H432 |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H52 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H431 (Replaces) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4233
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H30 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H37 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H39 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H52 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H431 (Replaces) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4233
H1805 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2546 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2241 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4233 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4233.pdf |