MA H4231 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Updating terminology and investigative practices related to the protection of person with disabilities
Title
Updating terminology and investigative practices related to the protection of person with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-11-26 | House | New draft of H117 |
2019-11-26 | House | Reported from the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H117 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4231
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3427 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1340 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S185 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2427 (Similar To) 2020-03-01 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3427 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1340 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S185 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2427 (Similar To) 2020-03-01 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4231 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4231.pdf |