MA H4215 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Warren be authorized to continue the employment of Steven Perkins, a member of the fire department of said town. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Warren to continue the employment of Steven Perkins
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-13 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-05-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-04-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-04-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-04-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-03-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-12-14 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4126 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3013 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3013 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4215 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4215.pdf |