MA H4201 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Reported, in part, by H4451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Reported, in part, by H4451
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2017 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements
Title
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2017 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Reported, in part, by H4451 |
2016-06-29 | House | Reported, in part, by H4450 |
2016-06-29 | House | Reported from the committee of conference |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Committee of conference appointed (Spilka-DiDomenico-deMacedo), in concurrence |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Senate insisted on its amendments |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-06-02 | House | Committee of conference appointed (Dempsey-Kulik-Smola) |
2016-06-02 | House | House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment |
2016-06-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call # 356 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0] |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Read third |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2305 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S4, amended |
2016-05-26 | Senate | For Senate actions, see S4 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Read second |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, May 24, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S4 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-04-28 | House | H4200, published as amended |
Same As/Similar To
S2305 (Replaces) 2016-05-26 - See H4201
S8 (Similar To) -
H2016 (Similar To) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H56
H54 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H4200 (Replaces) 2016-04-27 - Published as amended, see H4201
S4 (Replaced by) 2016-05-26 - See H4201
H4727 (Similar To) 2016-11-14 - Senate concurred
S28 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
H3333 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2015
S50 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - Passed to be engrossed
H3593 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Placed on file
S8 (Similar To) -
H2016 (Similar To) 2015-02-19 - Order adopted, see H56
H54 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H4200 (Replaces) 2016-04-27 - Published as amended, see H4201
S4 (Replaced by) 2016-05-26 - See H4201
H4727 (Similar To) 2016-11-14 - Senate concurred
S28 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Text of S21, printed as amended
H3333 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2015
S50 (Similar To) 2015-04-15 - Passed to be engrossed
H3593 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Placed on file
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4201 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4201.pdf |