MA H4188 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-03 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-03 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Judith Alexandre, an employee of Department of Children and Families. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Judith Alexandre, an employee of Department of Children and Families
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-03 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-12-02 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-11-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-11-07 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2019-10-31 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3861 (Similar To) 2019-06-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H75 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2019
H3862 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4250 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H75 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 3 of the Acts of 2019
H3862 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4250 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4188 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4188.pdf |