MA H4180 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H2989

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To ensure benefits through enhanced Selective Service registration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure benefits through enhanced Selective Service registration

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-07HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-11-07HouseNew draft of H2989
2019-11-07HouseReported from the committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H2989 (Replaces) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4180
H2990 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S172 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S2142 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback