MA H4168 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3888
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to creditable service for Abby Levin, a member of the Massachusetts Teachers’ Retirement System
Title
Relative to creditable service for Abby Levin, a member of the Massachusetts Teachers’ Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2023 | |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-12-11 | House | Enacted |
2023-12-07 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2023-12-04 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2023-11-29 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-11-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2023-11-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2023-11-08 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2023-11-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-11-08 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-08 | House | New draft of H3888 |
2023-11-08 | House | Pending new draft of H3888 |
2023-11-08 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3888 (Replaces) 2023-11-08 - New draft substituted, see H4168
H3892 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H3892 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4168 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4168.pdf |