MA H4155 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the disposition of property taken for non-payment of property taxes in the city of Chelsea. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Chelsea Affordable Housing Trust Fund Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
2019-12-05HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-11-15JointHearing scheduled for 11/21/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-10-30SenateSenate concurred
2019-10-28HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H862 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4015
S1506 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H3979 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4015 (Similar To) 2019-12-26 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback