CA SB1133 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1270.2 and 1289 of, and to add Section 1289.1 to, the Penal Code, relating to bail.
Title
Bail.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 16). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB S. and APPR. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1270.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1289 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1289.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |