MA H4146 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further regulate the prevention of cruelty to farm animals. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To upgrade hen welfare and establish uniform cage-free standards

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-31JointHearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-10-24SenateSenate concurred
2019-10-15HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
2019-10-10HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback