MA H4122 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Hamilton of Methuen, a petition of Ryan M. Hamilton and Francisco E. Paulino (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the mayor of the city of Methuen be authorized to appoint police cadets to the police department of said city. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the mayor of the city of Methuen to appoint police cadets to the Methuen Police Department
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5123 |
2024-11-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-06-26 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-10-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-10-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H5123 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4122 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4122.pdf |