MA H4114 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4074
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of bow and arrows for Sunday deer hunting
Title
Authorizing the use of bow and arrows for Sunday deer hunting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-06-04 | House | Motion to reconsider negatived |
2014-06-04 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2014-06-04 | House | Amendment rejected |
2014-06-04 | House | Read third |
2014-05-27 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-05-27 | House | New draft of H4074 |
2014-05-27 | House | Pending new draft of H4074 |
2014-05-27 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4074 (Replaces) 2014-05-27 - Amendment adopted (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means), see H4114
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4114 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4114.pdf |