MA H4098 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-25 - Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the protection of the public health through the regulation of indoor air quality within public buildings. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-25JointHearing scheduled for 10/05/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-09-21SenateSenate concurred
2023-09-18HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H3908 (Similar To) 2023-06-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2402 (Similar To) 2023-06-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4101 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4145 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied S2496
H4710 (Similar To) 2024-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback