MA H4091 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 1 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 296 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 1 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 296 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to candidates for elected office in the town of Provincetown. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the charter of the town of Provincetown
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-01 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 296 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2024-12-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-12-26 | House | Enacted |
2024-12-23 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2024-12-23 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-06-03 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-05-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-05-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-05-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-04-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 19, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-09-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-09-14 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4091 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4091.pdf |