MA H4083 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Paul O'Brien, an employee of the Trial Court. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a sick leave bank for Paul O'Brien, an employee of the Trial Court of the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-06 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2023
2023-10-02SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2023-10-02HouseEnacted
2023-10-02SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2023-10-02HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2023-09-28SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2023-09-28SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2023-09-25SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2023-09-21HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2023-09-14HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-09-14HouseRules suspended
2023-09-14HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2023-09-11HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2023-09-07SenateSenate concurred
2023-09-07HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary
2023-08-28HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H4539 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4644 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4749 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4740 (Similar To) 2024-06-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4749
H4755 (Similar To) 2024-07-03 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback