MA H406 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4408
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4408
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to employing appropriate discipline management techniques in schools. Education.
Title
Relative to safe schools
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Honan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4408 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 3, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/06/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-05-01 | House | Hearing on 05/06/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 cancelled |
2015-04-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/06/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4408 (Replaced by) 2016-07-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2758 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H404 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4145
H999 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4622
H1107 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4140
H1844 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2758 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H404 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4145
H999 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4622
H1107 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4140
H1844 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H406 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H406.pdf |