MA H4009 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Reported, in part, by H4512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to making appropriations for the fiscal year 2016 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2016 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-14HouseReported, in part, by H4512
2016-03-23HouseReported, in part, by H4116
2016-02-16HouseReferred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

S1 (Similar To) 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
H3675 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - See H3650
H61 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H3187 (Similar To) 2015-04-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2015
H3202 (Similar To) 2015-03-25 - Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback