MA H396 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4880
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent the automatic signing up of consumers for products or services. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To prohibit negative option sales and disclosure of financial and personal information without a consumer’s express agreement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4880 |
2021-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1915 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S419 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
S642 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S3136 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S419 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4471
S642 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S3136 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H396 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H396.pdf |