MA H3950 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4778

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to establishing a residential property assessed clean energy (R-PACE) program. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a residential property assessed clean energy (R-PACE) program in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-02HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4778
2024-03-28SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Sunday April 7, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-12-29JointHearing scheduled for 01/11/2024 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-11-03JointHearing scheduled for 11/09/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2023-06-29SenateSenate concurred
2023-06-26HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H4286 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4637 (Similar To) 2024-05-31 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2024 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H4803 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Pending new draft of H2333
H4778 (Replaced by) 2024-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback