MA H3948 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H582

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 431 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to annual immunization against influenza for children (House, No. 582), ought to pass with an amendment substituting therefore a bill with the same title (House, No. 3948). February 16, 2012.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to annual immunization against influenza for children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 431 of the Acts of 2012
2012-12-31SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2012-12-31HouseEnacted
2012-12-28HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment
2012-12-28HouseRules suspended
2012-12-24SenateRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2012-12-24SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2012-07-26SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2012-07-25SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, July 26, 2012
2012-07-17SenateRead and referred to the Senate committee on Ethics and Rules
2012-06-27HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2012-02-29HouseOrdered to a third reading
2012-02-29HouseNew draft of H582
2012-02-16HouseRecommended new draft for H582
2012-02-16HouseReported from the committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H582 (Replaces) 2012-02-29 - Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Health Care Financing)

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback