MA H582 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Health Care Financing)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Health Care Financing)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to annual immunization against influenza for children. Public Health.
Title
Relative to annual immunization against influenza for children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Health Care Financing) |
2012-02-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2012-02-16 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2012-02-16 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a bill with the same title (H3948) |
2011-08-08 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-03-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/05/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H582 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10478&generalCourtId=1 |